No. 23A999 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Thomas E. Creech, Applicant
v.
Tim Richardson, Warden
Docketed:May 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-275)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 07 2024Application (23A999) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2024 to July 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 09 2024Application (23A999) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonah Joshua Horwitz
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of ldaho
702 W. ldaho St. Ste. 900
Boise, ID 83702

JONAH_HORWITZ@FD.ORG
208 331 5530
Party name: Thomas Creech