No. 23A996
Title:Yoel Weisshaus, Applicant
v.
Steve Coy Teichelman, et al.
Docketed:May 8, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-11099)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2024Application (23A996) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 14, 2024 to July 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 08 2024Application (23A996) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Yoel Weisshaus1713 Wyoming Avenue
Forty Fort, PA 18704

yoelweisshaus@yahoo.com
Party name: Yoel Weisshaus