No. 23A993
Title:Gavin Blake Davis, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-50812)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2024Application (23A993) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 21, 2024 to July 20, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 09 2024Application (23A993) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gavin Blake Davis
    Counsel of Record
#00197510
KCDF
810 Commerce Street
Karnes City, TX 78118

Party name: Gavin B. Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States