No. 23A989
Title:Montana, Applicant
v.
Robert Murray Gibbons
Docketed:May 7, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(21-0413)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2024Application (23A989) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 17, 2024.
May 07 2024Application (23A989) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 18, 2024 to July 17, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601

PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: Montana