No. 23A986
Title:Dwight Russell, et al., Applicants
v.
Harris County, Texas, et al.
Docketed:May 3, 2024
Linked with 24-45
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-20005)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2024Application (23A986) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2024 to June 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 09 2024Application (23A986) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 15, 2024.
May 28 2024Application (23A986) to extend further the time from June 15, 2024 to July 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written Request
Jun 06 2024Application (23A986) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 15, 2024.
Jul 15 2024Waiver of Harris County, Texas, et al. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037

SETH.WAXMAN@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6800
Party name: Dwight Russell, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Harris County, Texas, et al.