No. 23A982
Title:Career Counseling, Inc., dba Snelling Staffing Services, a South Carolina Corporation, Applicant
v.
Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC
Docketed:May 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1119, 22-1136)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2024Application (23A982) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 20, 2024 to July 19, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
May 06 2024Application (23A982) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 19, 2024.
Jul 19 2024Writ of Certiorari of Career Counseling (Snelling) submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Glenn L. Hara
    Counsel of Record
Anderson + Wanca
3701 Algonquin Road, Suite 500
Rolling Meadows, IL 60008

ghara@andersonwanca.com
(847) 368-1500
Party name: Career Counseling (Snelling)