No. 23A965
Title:United States, Applicant
v.
Brent Brewbaker
Docketed:April 26, 2024
Linked with 23-1365
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-4544)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2024Application (23A965) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2024 to June 14, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 29 2024Application (23A965) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 14, 2024.
May 29 2024Application (23A965) to extend further the time from June 14, 2024 to July 12, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 31 2024Application (23A965) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States