No. 23A930 | |
Title: | Martin Shkreli, Applicant v. Federal Trade Commission, et al. |
Docketed: | April 17, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-728) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 12 2024 | Application (23A930) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 22, 2024 to May 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceProof of Service | |
Apr 17 2024 | Application (23A930) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 22, 2024. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Thomas M. Huff Counsel of Record | Attorney at Law P.O. Box 2248 Leesburg, VA 20177 thuff@law.gwu.edu | 703-665-3756 |
Party name: Martin Shkreli | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: FTC, et al. |