No. 23A912
Title:Frank R. Difranco, Applicant
v.
Patricia M. Fallon, Circuit Judge, Circuit Court of Illinois, Cook County, et al.
Docketed:April 11, 2024
Linked with 23-1339
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Illinois, First District
   Case Numbers:(1-22-0785)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2024Application (23A912) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2024 to June 21, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 11 2024Application (23A912) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until June 21, 2024.
Jun 20 2024Rule 35(3) Letter to the Clerk of Frank Difranco submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ilia Usharovich
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
224 S. Milwaukee Avenue Suite E
Wheeling, IL 60090

Ilia@usharolaw.com
8477702946
Party name: Frank Difranco