No. 23A889 | |
Title: | Walter Taylor, III, Applicant v. Vermont |
Docketed: | April 5, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Vermont |
Case Numbers: | (22-AP-211) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 27 2024 | Application (23A889) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 7, 2024 to June 6, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 08 2024 | Application (23A889) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 6, 2024. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Rebecca N. Turner Counsel of Record | Office of the Defender General 6 Baldwin Street 4th Floor Montpelier, VT 05633-3301 rebecca.turner@vermont.gov | 802-828-3165 |
Party name: Walter Taylor, III | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Lei Raymond Sun Counsel of Record | Rutland County State's Attorney's Office 400 Asa Bloomer State Office Building Rutland, VT 05701 Ray.Sun@vermont.gov | 802-786-2531 |
Party name: Vermont |