No. 23A868 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Steven Vernon Bixby, Applicant v. Bryan P. Stirling, Commissioner, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al. |
Docketed: | March 28, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-4) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 22 2024 | Application (23A868) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2024 to June 3, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Mar 28 2024 | Application (23A868) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 3, 2024. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
David Charles Weiss Counsel of Record | Capital Habeas Unit for the Fourth Circuit 129 West Trade Street Suite 300 Charlotte, NC 28202 DAVID_C_WEISS@FD.ORG | 919-897-6250 |
Party name: Steven Bixby |