No. 23A803
Title:Khan Mohammed, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:February 29, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3072)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2024Application (23A803) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 21, 2024 to April 22, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 05 2024Application (23A803) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Reedy Charles Swanson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20004

reedy.swanson@hoganlovells.com
202-537-5764
Party name: Khan Mohammed
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States