No. 23A801
Title:Richard Arlee Champion, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:February 29, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-6529)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 15 2024Application (23A801) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2024 to May 16, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 29 2024Application (23A801) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Arlee Champion
    Counsel of Record
Reg. No. 33773-058
U.S.P. Victorville Medium II
P.O. Box 3850
Adelanto, CA 92301

Party name: Richard A. Champion
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States