No. 23A772
Title:Jorge Galindo, Applicant
v.
Nebraska
Docketed:February 23, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-21-419)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2024Application (23A772) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 27, 2024 to April 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Feb 23 2024Application (23A772) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam J. Sipple
    Counsel of Record
12020 Shamrock Plaza
Suite 200
Omaha, NE 68154

Party name: Adam J. Sipple