No. 23A770
Title:Dearnta Lavon Thomas, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:February 23, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-7257)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2024Application (23A770) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 27, 2024 to March 28, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 23 2024Application (23A770) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 28, 2024.
Mar 15 2024Application (23A770) to extend further the time from March 28, 2024 to April 27, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 20 2024Application (23A770) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frances Hemsley Pratt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
1650 King Street, Suite 500
Alexandria, VA 22314

Fran_Pratt@fd.org
703-600-0815
Party name: Dearnta Lavon Thomas
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States