No. 23A765
Title:Malcolm H. Sage, Individually and in His Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates and Sage Realty, Applicant
v.
Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Docketed:February 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1107, 22-1110)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 15 2024Application (23A765) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2024 to April 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 21 2024Application (23A765) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 26, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Malcolm H. Sage
    Counsel of Record
45 Christopher St.
14B
New York, NY 10014

Party name: Malcolm H. Sage