No. 23A743
Title:Darryl Puderer, Applicant
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:February 9, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2023-KO-00494, 2023-KP-00624)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 30 2024Application (23A743) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2024 to March 7, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Feb 12 2024Application (23A743) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 7, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Darryl Puderer
    Counsel of Record
#601803
Raymond Laborde Correctional Center
1630 Prison Road
Cottonport, LA 71327-4055

(318) 876-2891
Party name: Darryl Puderer