No. 23A742
Title:Luis Alexis Briceno, Applicant
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:February 9, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division
   Case Numbers:(E2022-00414-CCA-R3-CD)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2024Application (23A742) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 12 2024Application (23A742) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tyler Mark Caviness
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Tyler M. Caviness
932 W Forest Blvd
Knoxville, TN 379029

tyler@cavinesslawfirm.com
8659369499
Party name: Luis Briceno