No. 23A738
Title:Commissioner of Internal Revenue, Applicant
v.
Isobel Berry Culp, et vir
Docketed:February 8, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1789)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2024Application (23A738) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2024 to March 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Application (23A738) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 19, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Danny Werfel, Commissioner of Internal Revenue