No. 23A734
Title:Dalibor Kabov and Berry Kabov, Applicants
v.
United States
Docketed:February 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50083, 19-50089)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2024Application (23A734) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2024 to March 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Application (23A734) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 13, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anne Margaret Voigts
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
601 S. California Ave., Ste. 100
Los Altos, CA 94024

AVOIGTS@KSLAW.COM
(650) 422-6710
Party name: Dalibor Kabov, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America