No. 23A731
Title:Public Utilities Commission of Ohio, Applicant
v.
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al.
Docketed:February 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3243)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2024Application (23A731) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 29, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 12 2024Application (23A731) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Jason Hendershot
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General's Office
30 E. Broad Street, 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

michael.hendershot@ohioago.gov
614.466.8980
Party name: Public Utilities Commission of Ohio
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al.