No. 23A730
Title:Darron Henderson, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:February 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2613)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2024Application (23A730) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2024 to March 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 07 2024Application (23A730) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brett Garrett Sweitzer
    Counsel of Record
Federal Community Defender Office for the EDPA
601 Walnut Street
Suite 540 West
Philadelphia, PA 19106

brett_sweitzer@fd.org
215-928-1100
Party name: Darron Henderson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States