No. 23A727
Title:Joel Michael Guy, Jr., Applicant
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:February 6, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division
   Case Numbers:(E2021-00560-CCA-R3-CD)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2024Application (23A727) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 06 2024Application (23A727) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Patrick Harwell
    Counsel of Record
Know County Public Defender's Community Law Office
1101 Liberty Street
Knoxville, TN 37919

JHARWELL@PDKNOX.ORG
8655946120
Party name: Joel Guy, Jr.