No. 23A722
Title:Luis Sanchez, et al., Applicants
v.
United States
Docketed:February 5, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-11923)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2024Application (23A722) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2024 to April 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Application (23A722) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 20, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen Francis Raiola
    Counsel of Record
Kibler Fowler & Cave LLP
100 South Juniper
3rd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107

sraiola@kfc.law
9145848987
Party name: Luis Sanchez, et al.