No. 23A720
Title:Jeremy Lee Sestak, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:February 5, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-8006)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2024Application (23A720) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2024 to March 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Feb 05 2024Application (23A720) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 31, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Lee Sestak
    Counsel of Record
#17437-091
Federal Correctional Institution
9595 W. Quincy Ave.
Littleton, CO 80123

Party name: Jeremy Lee Sestak
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States