No. 23A718
Title:Coronavirus Reporter, et al., Applicants
v.
Apple, Inc.
Docketed:February 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-15166)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2024Application (23A718) for writ of injunction, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Application (23A718) denied by Justice Kagan.
Feb 06 2024Application (23A718) refiled and submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written Request
Feb 21 2024Application (23A718) referred to the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Keith Allen Mathews
    Counsel of Record
AWP Legal
1000 Elm Street, Suite 800
Manchester, NH 03102

keith@awplegal.com
6039239855
Party name: Coronavirus Reporter, et al.