No. 23A717
Title:Call-A-Head Portable Toilets, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, et al.
Docketed:February 2, 2024
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Second Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(2019-10579)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2024Application (23A717) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2024 to April 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 06 2024Application (23A717) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Austin Reis Graff
    Counsel of Record
The Scher Law Firm, LLP
600 Old Country Road, Suite 440
Garden City, NY 11530

agraff@scherlawfirm.com
5167465040
Party name: Call-A-Head Portable Toilets, Inc., et al.