No. 23A716
Title:Ikorongo Texas LLC, et al., Applicant
v.
Bumble Trading LLC
Docketed:February 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2044)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 30 2024Application (23A716) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2024 to April 11, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2024Application (23A716) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 11, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey J. Angelovich
    Counsel of Record
Nix Patterson, LLP
3600 N. Capital of Texas Hwy.
Bldg. B, Suite 350
Austin, TX 78746

jangelovich@nixlaw.com
512-328-5333
Party name: Ikorongo Technology LLC and Ikorongo Texas LLC