No. 23A714
Title:Rodney Thomas Ternovsky, Applicant
v.
Florida
Docketed:February 1, 2024
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fifth District
   Case Numbers:(5D23-0091)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 30 2024Application (23A714) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2024 to March 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 01 2024Application (23A714) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Robert Ufferman
    Counsel of Record
Michael Ufferman Law Firm, P.A.
2022-1 Raymond Diehl Road
Tallahassee, FL 32308

UFFERMAN@UFFERMANLAW.COM
8503862345
Party name: Rodney Thomas Ternovsky