No. 23A713 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Richard Lee Tabler, Applicant
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:February 1, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-70001)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2024Application (23A713) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2024 to March 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Application (23A713) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 13, 2024.
Feb 22 2024Application (23A713) to extend further the time from March 13, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Claudia Van Wyk
    Counsel of Record
ACLU Capital Punishment Project
201 West Main Street
Suite 402
Durham, NC 27701

cvanwyk@aclu.org
2679716991
Party name: Richard Tabler