No. 23A709 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:David Eugene Matthews, Applicant
v.
Laura Plappert, Interim Warden
Docketed:February 1, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5471)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2024Application (23A709) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 01 2024Application (23A709) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David M. Barron
    Counsel of Record
Kentucky Department of Public Advocacy
5 Mill Creek Park
Section 101
Frankfort, KY 40601

david.barron@ky.gov
502-782-3601
Party name: David Matthews