No. 23A707
Title:Gavin G. Brown, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:January 31, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10878)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2024Application (23A707) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2024 to March 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 31 2024Application (23A707) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Robert Ufferman
    Counsel of Record
Michael Ufferman Law Firm, P.A.
2022-1 Raymond Diehl Road
Tallahassee, FL 32308

UFFERMAN@UFFERMANLAW.COM
8503862345
Party name: Gavin G. Brown