No. 23A706
Title:Juan Luis Leonor, Applicant
v.
Diana Sabatka-Rine, Assistant Director, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Docketed:January 31, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(A-23-000539)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 13 2024Application (23A706) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 28, 2024 to March 28, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Jan 31 2024Application (23A706) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 28, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Juan Luis Leonor#54664
Nebraska Correctional Youth Facility
2610 N. 20th Street East
Omaha, NE 68110

Party name: Juan Leonor