No. 23A704
Title:Ethel Oyekunle-Bubu, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:January 31, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-10620)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2024Application (23A704) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 25, 2024 to April 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 31 2024Application (23A704) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 26, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Beau B. Brindley
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Beau B. Brindley
53 W. Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1410
Chicago, IL 60604

BBBRINDLEY@GMAIL.COM
3127658878
Party name: Ethel Oyekunle-Bubu
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States