No. 23A701
Title:Martin Akerman, Applicant
v.
Merit Systems Protection Board
Docketed:January 30, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2023-2216)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2024Application (23A701) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Feb 02 2024Application (23A701) denied by The Chief Justice.
Feb 03 2024Application (23A701) refiled and submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written Request
Feb 14 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin Akerman
    Counsel of Record
2001 North Adams Street
Unit 440
Arlington , VA 22201

202-656-5601
Party name: Martin Akerman
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merit Systems Protection Board