No. 23A696
Title:Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Applicant
v.
United States Military Academy at West Point, et al.
Docketed:January 26, 2024
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Southern District of New York
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2024Application (23A696) for injunction pending appeal, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 27 2024Response to application (23A696) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due by 5pm (EST), Tuesday, January 30, 2024.
Jan 29 2024Letter of Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. submitted.
Main Document
Jan 30 2024Response to application from respondent United States Military Academy at West Point, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Reply of Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. in support of application submitted.
ReplyProof of Service
Feb 02 2024Application (23A696) referred to the Court.
Feb 02 2024Application (23A696) for writ of injunction pending appeal presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is denied. The record before this Court is underdeveloped, and this order should not be construed as expressing any view on the merits of the constitutional question.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

PATRICK@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
2075223163
Party name: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Military Academy West Point, et al.