No. 23A695
Title:John Stancu, Applicant
v.
Hyatt Corporation/Hyatt Regency Dallas
Docketed:January 26, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10280)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2024Application (23A695) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2024 to March 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 30 2024Application (23A695) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 19, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Stancu
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 133171
Dallas, TX 75313

(469) 567-3365
Party name: John Stancu