No. 23A692
Title:Montel Westley, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:January 26, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3356)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2024Application (23A692) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2024 to April 6, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 26 2024Application (23A692) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 6, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James R Willis
    Counsel of Record
Private Practice
75 Erieview Plaza
SUITE #108
Cleveland, OH 44114-1552

jrwillis-barrister@sbcglobal.net
2165231100
Party name: Montel Westley
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States