No. 23A691
Title:Ryan Morrison, Applicant
v.
Alvaro Ramos, in His Individual and Official Capacity, et al.
Docketed:January 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-55684)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2024Application (23A691) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2024 to February 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Application (23A691) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Joseph Tuosto
    Counsel of Record
The Appellate Law Firm
Office of Legal Affairs
188 Grand St., 2nd Floor, #1023
New York, NY 10013-3752

rjt48@juno.com
347-703-3129
Party name: Ryan Morrison