No. 23A689 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tremane Wood, Applicant
v.
Christe Quick, Warden
Docketed:January 25, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-6134)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2024Application (23A689) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 4, 2024 to March 21, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Application (23A689) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 21, 2024. (Justice Gorsuch is recused.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amanda Christine Bass
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of Arizona
850 West Adams Street, Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

AMANDA_BASS@FD.ORG
602-382-2734
Party name: Tremane Wood