No. 23A686
Title:Clifford Laines, Jr., Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:January 24, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12907, 21-11535)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2024Application (23A686) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2024 to March 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 24 2024Application (23A686) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ta'Ronce Montavious Stowes
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
150 West Flagler Street, Suite 1700
Miami, FL 33130

taronce_stowes@fd.org
3055307000
Party name: Clifford Laines
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America