No. 23A684
Title:Sabrina Gibson, Applicant
v.
Thomas F. Roupas, Jr., et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1259)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2024Application (23A684) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 21, 2024 to March 21, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jan 26 2024Application (23A684) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 21, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sabrina Gibson
    Counsel of Record
32 Carmine Place
Hampton, VA 23666

Party name: Sabrina Gibson