No. 23A683
Title:Jill Hill, et al., Applicants
v.
Michigan, et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1986)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2024Application (23A683) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 4, 2024 to April 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 24 2024Application (23A683) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley Ave. SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

JBURSCH@BURSCHLAW.COM
6164504235
Party name: Jill Hill, et al.