No. 23A679
Title:Jeremy Henning, Applicant
v.
Donald V. Snowden
Docketed:January 23, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1463)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2024Application (23A679) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Application (23A679) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until March 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

JLAMKEN@MOLOLAMKEN.COM
2025562010
Party name: Jeremy Henning