No. 23A677
Title:John Henry Ayanbadejo, Applicant
v.
Chanel Goosby, et al.
Docketed:January 22, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Fourteenth District
   Case Numbers:(14-20-00264-CV)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2024Application (23A677) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 23 2024Application (23A677) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Henry Ayanbadejo
    Counsel of Record
#150-218
2918 West Grand Parkway North
Katy, TX 77449

(832) 616-0772
Party name: John Henry Ayanbadejo