No. 23A674
Title:Tasha Mercedez Shelby, Applicant
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:January 22, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2015-M-01145)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2024Application (23A674) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 22 2024Application (23A674) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Valena Elizabeth Beety
    Counsel of Record
Indiana University Maurer School of Law
211 South Indiana Ave.
Bloomington, IN 47405

(773) 450-2384
Party name: Tasha Mercedez Shelby