No. 23A673
Title:Andrew Smart, Applicant
v.
Jamie LaManna
Docketed:January 22, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-6480)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2024Application (23A673) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Jan 22 2024Application (23A673) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Smart
    Counsel of Record
12A5165
Attica Correctional Facility
P.O. Box 149
Attica, NY 14011-0149

Party name: Andrew Smart