No. 23A672 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Samuel Fields, Applicant
v.
Scott Jordan, Warden
Docketed:January 22, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5065)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2024Application (23A672) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Application (23A672) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Evan Kirsch
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defenders Office
1000 Walnut St Ste 600
Kansas City, MO 64106

daniel_kirsch@fd.org
816-675-0923
Party name: Samuel Fields