No. 23A667
Title:Nancy Martin, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:January 22, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3045)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2024Application (23A667) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 13, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Application (23A667) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 14, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amanda Kelly Rice
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
150 W. Jefferson Ave., Suite 2100
Detroit, MI 48226

ARICE@JONESDAY.COM
3137333939
Party name: Nancy Martin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America