No. 23A665
Title:Tyshawn Shepard, Applicant
v.
Ohio
Docketed:January 22, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Ohio, Cuyahoga County
   Case Numbers:(111162)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2024Application (23A665) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2024 to March 24, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 22 2024Application (23A665) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 24, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erika Bloomfield Cunliffe
    Counsel of Record
Cuyahoga County Public Defender's Office
310 Lakeside Avenue
Suite 200
Cleveland, OH 44113

ECUNLIFFE@CUYAHOGACOUNTY.US
(216) 443-8353
Party name: Tyshawn Shepard